HI HB1889 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Act 101, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-06-28 - Act 101, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands workers' compensation medical benefits for firefighters to include coverage for breast cancer and cancer of the female reproductive organs. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Medical Benefits.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Labor and Technology: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-28 | Senate | Act 101, 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202). |
2024-06-28 | House | Act 101, on 06/27/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1202). |
2024-04-19 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 782). |
2024-04-19 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Garcia excused (2). |
2024-04-18 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 771). |
2024-04-18 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-15 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 677). |
2024-04-15 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Aquino Chair; Wakai, Rhoads, DeCoite Co-Chairs; Fevella. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 527) in amended form (SD 2). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Ihara). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3653) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Moriwaki, Aquino, DeCoite, Hashimoto, Inouye, Kidani, Kim, Lee, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kanuha, Shimabukuro. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura, Awa; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC/WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-24 9:45AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported from LBT/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3157) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Elefante, Fukunaga, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBT were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Aquino, Moriwaki, Ihara, Lee; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBT/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 3:00PM; CR 225 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to LBT/PSM, JDC/WAM. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 104). |
2024-03-01 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Quinlan, Woodson excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-03-01 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 812-24), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-27 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cochran. |
2024-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-24 2:00PM in House conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-06 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kapela, Nakashima, Ward excused (3). |
2024-02-06 | House | Reported from LGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 108-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-01 | House | The committee on LGO recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Garrett, Kapela, Martinez, Tam; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Sayama, Alcos. |
2024-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO on Thursday, 02-01-24 9:00AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-19 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-18 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2231 (Same As) 2024-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC/WAM.