HI HB1903 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-22 - Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 747).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires first responders to record in the incident report for each water rescue event the type of snorkel and mask, if any, worn by the person who was rescued or recovered. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Data About Snorkels And Masks.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-31 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-08 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-22 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 747). |
2022-04-21 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nakashima, Kitagawa Co-Chairs; Matayoshi, Ward. |
2022-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 883). |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: DeCoite Chair; Gabbard Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2022-04-18 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 715). |
2022-04-14 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2022-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 806) in amended form (SD 2). |
2022-04-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-22. |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3844) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2022-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 03-31-22 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3291) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2022-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, DeCoite, Baker, Riviere, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-22 1:00PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 49). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 768-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-03-01 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2022-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-01-22 1:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-15 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey excused (1). |
2022-02-15 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 368-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Todd, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi, LoPresti. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3206 (Same As) 2022-03-10 - Referred to JHA, CPC, referral sheet 24