HI HB1910 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a bill of rights for disabled persons.
Title
Disabled Persons; Bill of Rights
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14 at 10:00am. |
2014-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:35AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1910&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB1910_.HTM |