HI HB1922 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act 223, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-08 - Act 223, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the department of land and natural resources' rulemaking authority to include any rule deemed necessary to protect certain wildlife. Expands the board of land and natural resources' authority to timely adopt, amend, or repeal certain rules if the board finds that the action is necessary to implement effective and adaptive management measures in response to impacted natural resources or in light of newly available technology or data. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Wildlife.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-15 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-08 | Senate | Act 223, 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2024-07-08 | House | Act 223, on 07/08/2024 (Gov. Msg. No. 1324). |
2024-05-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2024-05-03 | Senate | Received notice of House agreement and passage on Final Reading (Hse. Com. No. 829). |
2024-05-01 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in SD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt excused (1). |
2024-05-01 | House | House agrees to Senate amendment(s). |
2024-04-26 | House | Deferred one day 05-01-24. |
2024-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-26-24. |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Received notice of House reconsideration of action in disagreeing to the amendments proposed by the Senate (Hse. Com. No. 811). |
2024-04-23 | House | Reconsideration of action taken on 04-11-24. |
2024-04-12 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 731). |
2024-04-11 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2024-04-09 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 537) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-09-24. |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3659) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 04-02-24 10:05AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3327) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2024-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, McKelvey; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Chang, Fevella. |
2024-03-12 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-15-24 1:00PM; CR 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2024-03-01 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 25). |
2024-02-29 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Souza voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cochran, Holt excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2024-02-21 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 02-29-24. |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 631-24) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2024-02-15 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Ilagan, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Souza; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Takayama. |
2024-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Thursday, 02-15-24 2:02PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Ward excused (4). |
2024-02-08 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2024-01-30 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Ganaden, Hashem, M. Mizuno, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2024-01-26 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Tuesday, 01-30-24 9:00AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to WAL, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2912 (Same As) 2024-01-24 - Referred to WTL, JDC.