HI HB1954 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-18 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals exemption for calabash style anonymous campaign contributions amounts that aggregate to less than $100 that are received from ten or more persons at the same political function.
Title
Campaign Finance
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan, San Buenaventura, Tupola voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, Nakashima, Souki excused (3). |
2016-02-18 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 451-16), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2016-02-11 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Creagan, Hashem, Kawakami, C. Lee, Morikawa, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) San Buenaventura; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Brower. |
2016-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-11-16 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1954&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1954_.HTM |