HI HB1958 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on LGO/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-06 - The committee(s) on LGO/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Labor and Industrial Relations to establish a three-year child care pilot grant program to provide grants to employers to assist in offering child care or caregiving support for their employees.
Title
Relating To Economic Development.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-06 | House | The committee(s) on LGO/HUS recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LGO/HUS on Tuesday, 02-06-24 9:15AM in House conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to LGO/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 1 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2973 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - The committee on LBT deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1958&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB1958_.HTM |