HI HB196 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB196
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allocates additional transient accommodations tax revenues to the counties of Kauai, Hawaii, and Maui. Sunsets 12/31/2030.
Title
Relating To Taxation.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-01-22 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2019-01-18 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB196 (Carry Over) 2019-01-22 - Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 2
SB183 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
SB183 (Same As) 2019-01-22 - Referred to EET/PSM, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=196&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HB196_.HTM |