HI HB1960 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies the GET exemption for unrelated trade or business activities of nonprofit organizations. Effective 1/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Nonprofit Organizations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-02 - House - House Economic Development: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 485-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 02-11-22 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Luke, McDermott excused (2). |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 113-22), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-02 | House | The committees on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Quinlan, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Onishi, Sayama, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti. |
2022-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by ECD on Wednesday, 02-02-22 10:00AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3201 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Notice of intent to veto (Gov. Msg. No. 1216)