HI HB1971 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-03 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that 5% of funds derived from the public land trust shall be expended by the department of Hawaiian home lands for development of farm and home ownership. (HB1971 HD1)
Title
Department of Hawaiian Home Lands; Public Land Trust Revenues
Sponsors
Rep. Mele Carroll [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] | Rep. Sharon Har [D] |
Rep. Michael Magaoay [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-03 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on WLO with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-02-03 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 76-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to WLO. | |
2010-01-27 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Carroll, Shimabukuro, Bertram, Brower, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Mizuno. | |
2010-01-22 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 01-27-10 9:30am in House conference room 329. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to HAW, WLO, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-15 | (H) Pending introduction. |