HI HB1985 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides compensation and services to persons who can demonstrate they were wrongfully convicted of a crime and imprisoned.
Title
Crime; Wrongful Conviction and Imprisonment; Innocence Redress; Office of Hawaiian Affairs Package
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-02-07 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-09-12 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-09-12. | |
2012-01-31 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-02-12 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-17 | (H) Prefiled |
Same As/Similar To
SB2176 (Same As) 2012-01-20 - (S) Referred to JDL, WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1985 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB1985_.HTM |