HI HB1985 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the Mauna Kea Management Authority and membership of the Authority. Establishes and specifies duties of the Mauna Kea candidate advisory council. Limits the number of telescopes that may be authorized on Mauna Kea. Authorizes the renegotiation of leases, subleases, easements, permits, and licenses pertaining to Mauna Kea. Requires that revenue derived from activities on Mauna Kea be shared with the Office of Hawaiian Affairs and the Department of Hawaiian Home Lands, as well as used for educational and other community purposes. Excludes Mauna Kea lands from the definition of "public lands". Provides for free access to Mauna Kea for traditional cultural purposes. Establishes police powers and provides for enforcement of laws on land under the jurisdiction of the Mauna Kea Management Authority. Appropriates funds. Takes effect on 12/31/2033. (SD2)
Title
Relating To Land Use.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; K. Rhoads, Galuteria Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-12 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 782) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 21; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Baker, Gabbard, Green, Ihara, Kim, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, L. Thielen . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Inouye, Tokuda). Excused, 2 (Senator(s) Harimoto, Kouchi). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-12-18. |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Floor amendment adopted as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment No. 20 offered. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from HRE/WTL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3569) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, K. Kahele, Kidani, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Riviere, Shimabukuro ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, S. Chang. |
2018-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/WTL/WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-18 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-16 | Senate | Re-Referred to HRE/WTL/WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to WTL/HWN, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 169). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 997-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 12:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 705-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 262-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, DeCoite, Creagan, Gates, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Lowen, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, C. Lee, McKelvey. |
2018-02-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Tuesday, 02-06-18 9:15AM in House conference room 312. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |