HI HB1992 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - (S) Act 093, 5/11/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 551).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - (S) Act 093, 5/11/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 551).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent the intermediate appellate court judges' express authority to subpoena witnesses, compel the production of evidence, and administer oaths. (HB1992 CD1)
Title
Intermediate Court of Appeals; Subpoenas; Oaths
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | (S) Act 093, 5/11/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 551). | |
2010-05-11 | (H) Act 093, on 5/11/2010 (Gov. Msg. No. 307). | |
2010-05-03 | (H) Transmitted to Governor. | |
2010-04-28 | (S) Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 630). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 645). | |
2010-04-27 | (H) Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting no (0) and none excused (0). | |
2010-04-27 | (S) Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Deferred until 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-26 | (H) Deferred to Tuesday, 04-27-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (S) Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 23-10). | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Monday 04-26-10. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 23-10) as amended in (CD 1). | |
2010-04-19 | (S) The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-19 | (H) The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Luke, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2010-04-16 | (H) Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Monday 04-19-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-13 | (H) Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Thursday, 04-15-10 2:15PM in conference room 325. | |
2010-04-12 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 558). | |
2010-04-12 | (H) House conferees appointed: Karamatsu Chair; Luke, Tsuji, Thielen. | |
2010-04-08 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 535). | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Taniguchi, Chair; Takamine, Slom. | |
2010-03-30 | (S) Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 282). | |
2010-03-29 | (H) House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 355) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2010-03-24 | (S) Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-24-10. | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2010-03-22 | (S) Reported from JGO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2828) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-03-12 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JGO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Takamine, Bunda, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. | |
2010-03-09 | (S) The committee(s) on JGO has scheduled a public hearing on 03-12-10 9:30AM in conference room 016. | |
2010-02-18 | (S) Referred to JGO. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2010-02-11 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 17). | |
2010-02-10 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting no (0) and M. Lee excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Carroll, Magaoay, Sagum excused (3). | |
2010-02-08 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193-10) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2010-01-28 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Karamatsu, Ito, Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Herkes, Luke, McKelvey, Mizuno, Morita, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Wakai, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2010-01-26 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 01-28-10 2:30 PM in House conference room 325. | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 2 | |
2010-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2010-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |