HI HB1995 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-17 - (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires establishments to post in a conspicuous place a poster that provides specified information relating to human trafficking and the National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline. Defines "establishment". Establishes penalties for violations of the poster requirement. Effective July 1, 2050. (HB1995 HD2)
Title
DLIR; National Human Trafficking Resource Center Hotline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-17 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Herkes, Kawakami, M. Lee, Mizuno, Morikawa excused (5). | |
2012-02-17 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 647-12) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-02-14 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Carroll, Coffman. | |
2012-02-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-14-12 2:05PM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, C. Lee, M. Lee, Souki excused (4). | |
2012-02-09 | (H) Reported from HUS/LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Yamashita, Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Luke, Souki, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Saiki, Takumi. | |
2012-02-06 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2012-02-02 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS/LAB on Monday, 02-06-12 10:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Referred to HUS/LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 2 | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-18 | (H) Pending introduction. |