HI HB1995 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-04-16 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-02 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-04-16 8:30AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the PUC to establish preferential rates for the purchase of energy that is used or consumed for agricultural activities. Requires the PUC to require electric and gas utilities to develop energy storage technology incentive programs to provide incentives to agricultural customers to acquire energy storage technology for use at the agricultural customers' sites.
Title
Public Utilities Commission; Preferential Energy Rates; Agricultural Activities; Incentives; Energy Storage Technology
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-02 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Thursday 02-04-16 8:30AM in conference room 312. |
2016-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Thursday, 02-04-16 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to AGR, EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2016-01-25 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1995&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB1995_.HTM |