HI HB1995 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to convene a working group that includes the participation of the HPHA executive director or designee, to study and examine the effects of prohibiting smoking and using tobacco products on the premises of substance abuse treatment facilities. Requires DOH to submit a report to the legislature prior to the 2021 regular session. Takes effect 12/31/2059. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Substance Abuse Treatment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House Human Services & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2). |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Say. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |