HI HB1995 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-01 - Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "capital investment costs" to include the planting of trees having an expected lifespan of at least 15 years.
Title
Relating To Capital Improvements.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-01 | House | Re-referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2537 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=1995&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB1995_.HTM |