HI HB2027 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a dark night skies protection advisory committee to assist the Department of Land and Natural Resources in the development of a statewide dark night skies protection strategy to preserve dark night skies and reduce light pollution. Sunsets the existing advisory committee under the University of Hawaii on 7/1/2024. Effective 7/1/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Light Pollution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Takayama, Todd excused (3). |
2024-02-14 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 393-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2024-02-08 | House | The committee on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Cochran, Gates, Kahaloa, Woodson, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Perruso. |
2024-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 02-08-24 9:30AM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Subjects
Dark Night Skies Protection Advisory Committee
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Light Pollution
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Light Pollution