HI HB2030 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes an appropriation to fund 1 full-time equivalent (1.0 FTE) agricultural appraiser position within the Department of Agriculture.
Title
Relating To Agriculture.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on AGR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2020-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 02-05-20 8:35AM in House conference room 312. |
2020-01-23 | House | Referred to AGR, FIN, referral sheet 4 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2710 (Same As) 2020-03-09 - Referred to AGR, FIN , referral sheet 36
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2030&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HB2030_.HTM |