HI HB2047 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a primary promise pilot program within the Department of Education. Requires the Department to identify elementary schools having low literacy rates or a disproportionate number of students reading below grade level. Appropriates moneys to hire teachers and instructional aides to provide instruction to students in grades K-3 who read below grade level in those identified schools. Sunsets 6/30/2025.
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | The committee(s) on EDN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 02-08-22 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3266 (Same As) 2022-01-28 - Referred to EDU, WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2047&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2047_.HTM |