HI HB2051 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 137, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act 137, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the criteria for the works of art to be commissioned to honor the late U.S. Senator Daniel K. Inouye and the late U.S. Representative Patsy T. Mink pursuant to Act 281, SLH 2013. Amends the appropriation to $250,000 for fiscal year 2014-2015 only. Amends the expending agency. (HB2051 CD1)
Title
Public Art; State Foundation on Culture and the Arts; Daniel Inouye; Patsy Mink; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | Senate | Act 137, 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). |
2014-06-26 | House | Act 137, on 6/24/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1240). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Ito excused (3). |
2014-04-25 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 78-14). |
2014-04-25 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 78-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Tokioka, Awana, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thrusday, 04-24-14 at 5:00PM in Conference Room 423. |
2014-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-24-14 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-17 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-22-14 10:10AM in conference room 423. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Takai, Tokioka Co-Chairs; Awana, Ward Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Wakai Chair; Kidani Co-Chair; Slom Member. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 592) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-04 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3310) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | Reported from TEC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2896) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TEC were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Nishihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Tokuda. |
2014-03-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on TEC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-11-14 1:15PM in conference room 414. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to TEC, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 80). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 575-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-20-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cachola, Carroll excused (2). |
2014-02-11 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 307-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Awana, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott, Wooley. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in House conference room 312. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2617 (Same As) 2014-03-21 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Ward, Yamane excused (3).