HI HB2051 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-25 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:30PM in conference room 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for a grant to Weed and Seed Hawaii, Inc., to maintain the weed and seed strategy, which is a collaborative effort to reclaim, restore, and rebuild communities. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To The Weed And Seed Strategy.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Rep. Sean Quinlan [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] |
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-25 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday 04-26-18 1:30PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-24 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Wednesday 04-25-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-23 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Tuesday, 04-24-18 2:00PM in conference room 329. |
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Taniguchi Chair; Keith-Agaran Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Nishimoto, Cullen Co-Chairs; Fukumoto, Holt, Thielen. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 650) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3623) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Kidani. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-03-18 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3037) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 303). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-06-18. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1037-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-27 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 02-27-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 592-18), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |