HI HB2059 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to IAC/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-26 - Referred to IAC/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6
Pending: House Intrastate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes requirements for licensure by endorsement for physicians, surgeons, and osteopathic physicians. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Chapter 453, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to IAC/HHS, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2653 (Same As) 2018-06-14 - Act 044, 06/13/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1144).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2059&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HB2059_.HTM |