HI HB2068 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-13 - The committee on CPH deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Limits the period of DOH commitment for those defendants charged with a non-violent class C felony and found to be unfit to proceed under chapter 704, HRS. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To The Administration Of Justice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-26 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-13 | Senate | The committee on CPH deferred the measure. |
2020-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-20 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Referred to CPH, JDC. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 313). |
2020-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Har voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Matsumoto, Okimoto, Thielen, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Creagan, Eli excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 03-03-20. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 991-20) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-26 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, Nakashima, Perruso, Say, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2020-02-25 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-26-20 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-26-20 at 2:00pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2020-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Yamashita excused (2). |
2020-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 207-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 02-06-20 8:45AM in House conference room 329. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |