HI HB2068 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-18 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts construction procurements from the provisions in the Hawaii public procurement code that incentivize contractors and subcontractors to use Hawaii products. Effective 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Hawaii Products.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-11 - House - House Government Reform: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-18 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McKelvey voting no (1) and Representative(s) Eli, Kapela excused (2). |
2022-02-18 | House | Reported from GVR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 643-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-11 | House | The committees on GVR recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Wildberger, Eli, Ichiyama, Mizuno, Woodson, Yamashita, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-11-22 9:30AM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-09 | House | The committee(s) on GVR recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-11-22 at 9:30AM. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by GVR on Wednesday, 02-09-22 9:30AM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to GVR, CPC, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3036 (Same As) 2022-01-26 - Referred to GVO, WAM.