HI HB207 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB207
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals section 46-19.8, Hawaii Revised Statutes, and Act 53, Session Laws of Hawaii 2017, which prohibited the counties from adopting codes and regulations that would require the installation or retrofitting of residential fire sprinklers in one- and two-family dwellings and other types of structures.
Title
Relating To Public Safety.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-01-27 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1 |
2021-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2021-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB448 (Same As) 2022-03-17 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HB207 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
HB207 (Carry Over) 2021-01-27 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=207&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB207_.HTM |