HI HB2070 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a watershed initiatives program in DLNR. Subjects program employees to the civil service laws. Appropriates funds for FY 2014-2015.
Title
DLNR; Watershed Initiatives ($)
Sponsors
Rep. Sharon Har [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Isaac Choy [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] |
Rep. Calvin Say [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 8:30AM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on WAL recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14. |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 02-07-14 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-21 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2014-01-21 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-17 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2070&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2070_.HTM |