HI HB2070 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-13 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Attorney General to investigate an alleged violation of state law by a county police officer if the prosecuting attorney of the county that employs the police officer has declined to prosecute the police officer and the victim of the alleged violation submits a written request to investigate the alleged violation. (HB2070 HD1)
Title
Relating To Investigations By The Attorney General.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:30PM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to PSM, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 304). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Tokioka, Yamane excused (3). |
2018-03-01 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 891-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, Morikawa. |
2018-01-30 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 02-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |