HI HB2115 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2014 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-24 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Med-QUEST and Medicaid coverage for chiropractic care, limited to 24 visits per calendar year. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD2).
Title
Chiropractic Care; Med-QUEST; Medicaid; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-14 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-24-14 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Tuesday 04-22-14 4:15PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-15 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Wednesday, 04-16-14 4:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 673). |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Carroll, Nishimoto Co-Chairs; Kobayashi, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Chun Oakland Chair; Kidani, Baker Co-Chairs; Taniguchi, Slom Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 602) in amended form (SD 2). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3213) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2014-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Kouchi. |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-28-14 9:35AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2991) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Kidani, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Green. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai. |
2014-03-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-14 1:15PM in conference room 016. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HMS/CPN, WAM. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 163). |
2014-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Hanohano, Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, Har, Thielen, Woodson excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-28 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 710-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-21 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen. |
2014-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Friday, 02-21-14 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Jordan voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Creagan, Nakashima, Takumi excused (5). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-13 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Hashem, Morikawa, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Belatti, Creagan, Oshiro. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Thursday, 02-13-14 9:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2479 (Same As) 2014-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.