HI HB2136 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-11 - The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases the minimum hourly wage to $8.00 per hour in 01/01/2015, $8.50 in 01/01/2016, and $9.00 in 01/01/2017. Increases the tip credit to $1.00. Requires employers to increase wages of non-tipped employees by $1.00 if using the tip credit for their tipped employees.
Title
Minimum Wage; Tip Credit; Increase
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Linda Ichiyama [D] | Rep. Gregg Takayama [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] |
Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-11 | House | The committee(s) on LAB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-10 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-11-14 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2136&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2136_.HTM |