HI HB2142 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - (H) The committee(s) on HSG/WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-01 - (H) The committee(s) on HSG/WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the DOE to convey closed public school facilities to the HHFDC for development of affordable rental housing units.
Title
Affordable Housing; Public School Facilities; Closure; Conveyance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-01 | (H) The committee(s) on HSG/WLO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-27 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/WLO on Wednesday, 02-01-12 8:30AM in House conference room 325. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Referred to HSG/WLO, EDN, FIN, referral sheet 5 | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-19 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2142 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2142_.HTM |