HI HB2145 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Incorporates the kupuna caregivers program into the kupuna care program and adds services for care recipients, caregivers, and employed caregivers. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Kupuna Care Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 518-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2022-02-15 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Tuesday, 02-15-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3113 (Same As) 2022-06-27 - Act 160, on 06/27/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1261).