HI HB2145 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-24 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Adds the Chairperson of the Board of Trustees of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs to the Board of Agriculture.
Title
Relating To The Board Of Agriculture.
Sponsors
Rep. Kirstin Kahaloa [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] |
Rep. Darius Kila [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-24 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 2 |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2447 (Same As) 2024-03-07 - Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 16
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2145&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2145_.HTM |