HI HB2158 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-2)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the issuance of retail tobacco permits and sale of tobacco products and electronic smoking devices by businesses that are located within seven hundred fifty feet of a school, public park, or public housing complex. (HB2158 HD1)
Title
Relating To Tobacco.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 224-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont, Tupola; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHS on Tuesday, 02-06-18 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to HHS, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2304 (Same As) 2018-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Tupola voting no (1) and Representative(s) C. Lee, Lowen, McDermott, Souki, Tokioka excused (5).