HI HB2170 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDB/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-01-27 - Referred to EDB/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a pilot project within the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism, to provide certain tax and other benefits, similar to those provided in an enterprise zone, for physicians and dentists who agree to work within those areas for a certain period. Provides that no agreement may be entered into after June 30, 2021 and no benefits may be granted after June 30, 2028.
Title
Medical Practice Zone Designation; Medically Underserved Areas
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB/HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2016-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2170&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HB2170_.HTM |