HI HB2172 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes and appropriates funds for an Office of Strategic Partnerships and Development to specifically analyze, evaluate, recommend, coordinate, oversee, and manage public-private partnerships that benefit the University of Hawaii. Removes reference to the Board of Regents having exclusive jurisdiction over the internal structure, management, and operation of the University of Hawaii. Establishes a 5-year University of Hawaii public-private partnership pilot project to allow the university to enter into public-private partnerships, under certain conditions. Effective 1/1/2050. (SD2)
Title
Relating To University Of Hawaii Public-private Partnerships.
Sponsors
Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Lei Learmont [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 801). |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: K. Kahele Chair; Wakai, English Co-Chairs. |
2018-04-16 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 609). |
2018-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Johanson, McKelvey, Holt Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Ward. |
2018-04-13 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 608). |
2018-04-12 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2018-04-10 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 679) in amended form (SD 2). |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Taniguchi . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-10-18. |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3601) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2018-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kidani, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-18 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Reported from HRE/ETT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3008) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HRE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kim, Keith-Agaran, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2018-03-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Baker, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi, Galuteria. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/ETT has scheduled a public hearing on 03-13-18 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HRE/ETT, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 195). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Choy voting no (1) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 985-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Kobayashi. |
2018-02-23 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-28-18 11:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 756-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-15 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Hashem, Creagan, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Kong, Quinlan. |
2018-02-13 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 02-15-18 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committee(s) on HED recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-15-18 at 2:00 PM in room 309. |
2018-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HED on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:10PM in House conference room 309. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HED with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 128-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HED. |
2018-02-01 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-01-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB, HED, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |