HI HB2173 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-23 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employers and educational institutions from requiring employees, applicants, students, and prospective students to provide protected personal online account information. Authorizes private civil actions against violators. Takes effect on 1/1/3000. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Online Account Privacy.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | Reported from LBR/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3204) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Tokuda, S. Chang, Espero, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. |
2018-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in LBR were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, English, S. Chang, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on LBR/CPH added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 03-21-18 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Re-Referred to LBR/CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Referred to LBR/HRE/CPH, JDC. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 316). |
2018-03-06 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Woodson excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1088-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-03-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-01-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 701-18) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to JUD. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Ito, LoPresti, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Yamane, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2018-02-08 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Tupola excused (2). |
2018-02-08 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 170-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2018-02-06 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 02-06-18 10:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-29 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 11 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB/HED, CPC, JUD, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-22 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-19 | House | Pending introduction. |