HI HB2173 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to TRS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-03 - Referred to TRS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires consecutive terms of imprisonment for anyone convicted as a repeat or habitual offender if arising from same conduct as conviction for operating a vehicle without an ignition interlock device. Requires any person operating a vehicle with an ignition interlock to have government issued identification in their immediate possession. Extends the lookback period under provisions relating to ignition interlock requirements from five to ten years. Expands the offense of circumventing or tampering with an ignition interlock to include obscuring the camera lens. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Ignition Interlock Devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - House - House Transportation: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to TRS, JDC. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 181). |
2020-02-28 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, DeCoite, Holt, Thielen excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 926-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-25 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Brower, Lowen, McKelvey, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Perruso; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Nakashima, Yamane. |
2020-02-24 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 02-25-20 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-25-20 at 2:30pm. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Monday, 02-24-20 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2020-02-11 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Quinlan excused (2). |
2020-02-11 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 289-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Hashem, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Matayoshi, Woodson. |
2020-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 02-05-20 10:15AM in House conference room 423. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to TRN, JUD, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2329 (Same As) 2020-07-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 629).