HI HB2173 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Updates the Uniform Controlled Substances Act, chapter 329, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to make it consistent with amendments in the federal controlled substances law as required by section 329-11, Hawaii Revised Statutes.
Title
Relating To The Uniform Controlled Substances Act.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3141 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 106, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1206).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2173&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2173_.HTM |