HI HB2174 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-14 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health insurers, mutual benefit societies, and health maintenance organizations to provide coverage for autism spectrum disorder treatments. Effective July 1, 2112. (HB2174 HD2)
Title
Mandatory Health Coverage; Autism Spectrum Disorders
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-14 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Fale, Hanohano, Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 484-14) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Belatti, Brower, Creagan, Evans, Har, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Yamane, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Ito, Oshiro. |
2014-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-02-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14, 2:00PM. |
2014-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 02-10-14 5:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2014-02-07 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Tokioka, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-02-07 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 235-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Carroll, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Oshiro, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Woodson. |
2014-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-14 at 8:30am. |
2014-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 01-31-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-23 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |