HI HB2174 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-10 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the title of chapter 386, part V, subpart C, Hawaii Revised Statutes (HRS), to add reserve public safety law enforcement officers. Amends the workers' compensation law to include reserve public safety law enforcement officers to the list of covered volunteer occupations. Allows reserve public safety law enforcement officers who are injured under the conditions specified in section 386-3, HRS, to receive workers' compensation. Adds reserve public safety law enforcement officers to the list of volunteers who are covered under the conditions for computing average weekly wages. Effective 12/25/2040. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Workers' Compensation Law.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Saiki [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Labor & Tourism: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-10 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2022-02-10 | House | Reported from LAT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 164-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2022-02-08 | House | The committees on LAT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Sayama, Belatti, Holt, D. Kobayashi, Quinlan, Takayama, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAT on Tuesday, 02-08-22 9:30AM in House conference room 312 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-01 | House | Re-referred to LAT, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-24 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3142 (Same As) 2022-06-17 - Act 050, on 06/17/2022 (Gov. Msg. No. 1150).