HI HB2189 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-28 - Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3
Pending: House Economic Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows direct shipment of beer and distilled spirits by certain licensees. Requires the liquor commission of each county to adopt rules and regulations.
Title
Relating To Intoxicating Liquor.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to ECD, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2289 (Same As) 2022-01-24 - Referred to GVO, JDC/CPN.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2189&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HB2189_.HTM |