HI HB2203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to GVO/JDC/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-06 - Referred to GVO/JDC/PSM, WAM.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes an enforcement division in the Department of the Attorney General. Transfers to the Department of the Attorney General Enforcement Division the law enforcement activities of the Department of Land and Natural Resources Division of Conservation and Resources Enforcement; Department of Public Safety state law enforcement officers and narcotics enforcement investigators with the Narcotics Enforcement Division; and Department of Transportation Harbors Division. Repeals the sunset of Act 116, Session Laws of Hawaii 2013, as amended by section 4 of Act 101, SLH 2015. (HB2203 HD1)
Title
Relating To Law Enforcement.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Referred to GVO/JDC/PSM, WAM. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 201). |
2018-03-02 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) McDermott, Thielen, Tupola, Ward voting no (4) and Representative(s) Ing, San Buenaventura, Say, Yamane excused (4). Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-03-02 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 946-18), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2018-02-22 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Fukumoto, Gates, Holt, Lowen, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) DeCoite, Kobayashi, Nakamura; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Ward; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Keohokalole, Tupola. |
2018-02-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 02-22-18 1:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2018-02-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Har, Tupola, Ward voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Say, Thielen voting no (2) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Ing, Nakamura, Onishi, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-16 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 593-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-02-13 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Thielen; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-09 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 02-13-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-02-09 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, McDermott, Souki, Tupola, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-02-09 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 245-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2018-02-08 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Evans, Ichiyama, Keohokalole, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2018-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 02-08-18 9:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2018-01-31 | House | Re-referred to LAB, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 13 |
2018-01-26 | House | Referred to LAB/TRN/PBS/WAL, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 8 |
2018-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2018-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2909 (Same As) 2018-07-10 - Act 124, on 07/05/2018 (Gov. Msg. No. 1225).