HI HB2207 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes the requirement that applicants for a license in psychology complete one year of post doctoral training.
Title
Psychologist; Licensure; Post Doctoral Training Requirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-12 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-14 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2014-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-14 at 10:00am. |
2014-02-03 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-05-14 10:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2611 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Referred to CPN.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2207&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/Bills/HB2207_.HTM |