HI HB2208 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 28-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Re-Referred to HMS, JDC.
Pending: Senate Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the time period by which a civil action for childhood sexual abuse may be initiated, including an otherwise timebarred action. Adopts certain procedural requirements prior to the filing of a civil action for childhood sexual abuse or naming of "Doe" defendants. Authorizes a court to require personnel of legal entities to undergo training on traumainformed response. Effective 7/1/2060. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Sexual Abuse Of Minors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-23 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Health, Human Services, & Homelessness: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS, JDC. |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDC/WAM. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 76). |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Matayoshi, Todd excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2022-03-03 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 677-22), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2022-02-23 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-02-18 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Wednesday, 02-23-22 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-02-17 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2022-02-17 | House | Reported from HHH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 523-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2022-02-10 | House | The committees on HHH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Tam, Gates, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2022-02-07 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HHH on Thursday, 02-10-22 9:00AM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2022-01-28 | House | Referred to HHH, JHA, referral sheet 3 |
2022-01-26 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pending introduction. |