HI HB2210 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-14 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the Office of Planning to conduct a business climate report. Takes effect on 7/1/2112. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Office Of Planning.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] | Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] |
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. James Tokioka [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - House - House Economic Development & Business: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Takayama excused (2). |
2020-02-14 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 633-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2020-02-12 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kitagawa, Eli, Ichiyama, Johanson, Quinlan, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-02-10 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-12-20 10:35AM in conference room 309. |
2020-02-07 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-12-20. |
2020-02-05 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Friday, 02-07-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-02-05 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-07-20. |
2020-01-31 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 02-05-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-31 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 02-05-20. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill re-scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 9:30AM in conference room 309. |
2020-01-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 01-31-20 8:30AM in House conference room 309. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |