HI HB2213 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Act 182, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-03 - Act 182, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the issuance of special purpose revenue bonds to assist West Maui Hospital Foundation, Inc. in establishing a hospital in west Maui. (HB2213 CD1)
Title
Special Purpose Revenue Bonds; West Maui Hospital Foundation, Inc. ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-03 | Senate | Act 182, 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285). |
2014-07-03 | House | Act 182, on 7/1/2014 (Gov. Msg. No. 1285). |
2014-05-05 | House | Transmitted to Governor. |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 751). |
2014-04-30 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 720). |
2014-04-29 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-29 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito excused (1). |
2014-04-24 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 36-14). |
2014-04-24 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-29-14. |
2014-04-24 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 36-14) as amended in (CD 1). |
2014-04-23 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Ing, Woodson, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-04-23 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Keith-Agaran; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 5:00PM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-22-14 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-16 | House | Bill scheduled for Conference Committee Meeting on Monday, 04-21-14 9:10AM in conference room 229. |
2014-04-14 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 675). |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Green Chair; Baker, Chun Oakland Co-Chairs; Keith-Agaran, Slom Members. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 684). |
2014-04-14 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Belatti, Ing Co-Chairs; Woodson, Fukumoto Members. |
2014-04-11 | Senate | Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 676). |
2014-04-10 | House | House disagrees with Senate amendment (s). |
2014-04-08 | House | Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 616) in amended form (SD 1). |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 2 (Galuteria, Hee). Transmitted to House. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 04-08-14. |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3211) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2014-03-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Kouchi, Ruderman, L. Thielen, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2014-03-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-25-14 9:10AM in conference room 211. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2957) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2014-03-17 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Slom. |
2014-03-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-17-14 1:45PM in conference room 229. |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 92). |
2014-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Say excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 618-14), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2014-02-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2014-02-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 02-19-14 10:00AM in House conference room 308. |
2014-02-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Carroll, Takumi excused (3). |
2014-02-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 475-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2014-02-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Creagan, Hashem, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Oshiro. |
2014-02-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 02-12-14 8:30AM in House conference room 329. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3043 (Same As) 2014-02-05 - The committee on HTH deferred the measure.