HI HB2227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Re-Referred to EET, WAM.
Pending: Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Chief Energy Officer of the Hawaii State Energy Office to adopt rules to enforce minimum efficiency standards for certain products and establish or amend appliance efficiency standards in certain situations. Regulates the appliance efficiency standards for air purifiers and portable electric spas. Takes effect on 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Energy Efficiency.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] |
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Tina Wildberger [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House Energy & Environmental Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Re-Referred to EET, WAM. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Referred to EET/CPH, WAM. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 77). |
2020-02-27 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. |
2020-02-27 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 728-20), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2020-02-24 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Holt, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 02-24-20 1:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2020-02-12 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2020-02-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 312-20), recommending referral to FIN. |
2020-02-06 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Har, Mizuno, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Kong, Matsumoto. |
2020-02-04 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 02-06-20 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2020-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Okimoto voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 32-20) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2020-01-30 | House | The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Lowen, Wildberger, Har, Tarnas, Todd, Yamane, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2020-01-27 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Thursday, 01-30-20 8:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2020-01-27 | House | Referred to EEP, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 5 |
2020-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2020-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB3024 (Same As) 2020-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.