HI HB2234 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1).
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the sunset date and makes permanent the law shielding county lifeguards from liability.
Title
Tort Liability Lifeguards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Yamane excused (1). |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 98-14), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2014-01-31 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Cullen, Kawakami, Say, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Nishimoto; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hanohano, C. Lee. |
2014-01-29 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 01-31-14 9:15AM in House conference room 325. |
2014-01-27 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 6 |
2014-01-23 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2014-01-21 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2783 (Same As) 2014-01-23 - Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM.