HI HB2250 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Re-referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-31 - Re-referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 7
Pending: House Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Law Enforcement to coordinate crisis intervention training for state and county law enforcement agencies and crisis intervention officers. Requires the Department of Health to certify crisis intervention officers. Defines "crisis intervention officer". Authorizes crisis intervention officers to order persons determined to be imminently dangerous to themselves or others to be transported to a designated behavioral health crisis center. Establishes positions. Declares that the general fund expenditure ceiling is exceeded. Makes an appropriation.
Title
Relating To Crisis Intervention.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-31 | House | Re-referred to HLT, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 7 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to JHA, FIN, referral sheet 3 |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced and Pass First Reading. |
2024-01-22 | House | Pending introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB2345 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-24 4:45 PM; CR 016.
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Crisis Intervention
Crisis Intervention Officers
DLE
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling
Positions
Training
Crisis Intervention
Crisis Intervention Officers
DLE
DOH
Expenditure Ceiling
Positions
Training
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2250&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HB2250_.HTM |