HI HB2255 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (H) The committee(s) on PBM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-02 - (H) The committee(s) on PBM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii paroling authority to establish a medical release program for inmates who are permanently and totally disabled, terminally ill, or geriatric and pose no public safety risk. Request the department of public safety to assess and refer inmates to the Hawaii paroling authority. Sets conditions for medical release.
Title
Paroling Authority; Medical Release of Ill and Disabled Inmates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-02 | (H) The committee(s) on PBM recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. | |
2012-01-30 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 02-02-12 9:00AM in House conference room 309. | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Referred to PBM, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 6 | |
2012-01-23 | (H) Introduced and Pass First Reading. | |
2012-01-20 | (H) Pending introduction. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HB&billnumber=2255 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/HB2255_.HTM |